05/13/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2010. | |||
05/13/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
05/06/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5055.) To Senate. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee May 4.) | |||
04/15/2010 | To Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/08/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3113.) To Assembly. | |||
03/22/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2986.) To Third Reading. | |||
03/10/2010 | Set for hearing March 22. | |||
03/01/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
02/04/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |||
01/20/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |