California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR63 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/13/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 63CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 16 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 13, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 8, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 1, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee (Coauthors: Senators Alquist, Calderon, Cedillo, Correa, Denham, Florez, Hancock, Harman, Hollingsworth, Leno, Negrete McLeod, Oropeza, Padilla, Strickland, Walters, Wright, and Wyland) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Beall, Charles Calderon, Conway, Coto, DeB Leon, Emmerson, Eng, Fuller, Hagman, Hernandez, Hill, Jones, Ma, Mendoza, Portantino, Ruskin, Salas, Solorio, Swanson, and Torres) JANUARY 20, 2010 Relative to secondhand goods. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 63, Yee. Secondhand goods. This measure would urge the Department of Justice to ensure compliance with a requirement that the department develop a standard format to be used statewide for purposes of reporting secondhand dealer transactions. WHEREAS, Section 21625 of the Business and Professions Code provides that it is the intent of the Legislature to curtail the dissemination of stolen property and to facilitate the recovery of stolen property by means of a uniform, statewide, state-administered program of regulation of persons whose principal business is the buying, selling, trading, auctioning, or taking in pawn of tangible personal property and to aid the State Board of Equalization to detect possible sales tax evasion; and WHEREAS, Existing law requires secondhand dealers and coin dealers, on forms either approved or provided at actual cost by the Department of Justice, to report daily all tangible personal property purchased, taken in trade or pawn, or accepted for sale on consignment or auctioning, to the chief of police or sheriff; and WHEREAS, Prior to 2000, existing law generally required those forms to be submitted by mail; and WHEREAS, In 2000, the Legislature enacted Chapter 994 of the Statutes of 2000 to require the Department of Justice, in consultation with local law enforcement agencies, to develop clear and comprehensive descriptive categories for this property and to develop, also in consultation with these agencies and representatives of the secondhand and coin dealer businesses, a standard format to be used statewide to transmit this report electronically; and WHEREAS, Implementation of that standard format for the purposes of electronic transmission has yet to occur; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature urges the Department of Justice to ensure compliance with the requirements of Chapter 994 of the Statutes of 2000 at the earliest possible time; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Justice and to the author for appropriate distribution.