07/06/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2010. | |||
07/06/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
06/28/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4098.) To enrollment. | |||
06/23/2010 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
06/02/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
06/01/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Page 5416.) To Senate. | |||
05/28/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 5342.) To third reading. | |||
05/20/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee May 20). | |||
05/11/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/22/2010 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
03/25/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
03/25/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3023.) To Assembly. | |||
03/24/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
02/12/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |