LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR73
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR73
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR73
Compare Versions
SCR73 Chaptered July 6, 2010
SCR73 Enrolled June 29, 2010
SCR73 Amended June 1, 2010
SCR73 Amended May 28, 2010
SCR73 Amended May 11, 2010
SCR73 Introduced February 12, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SCR73 Chaptered July 6, 2010
SCR73 Enrolled June 29, 2010
SCR73 Amended June 1, 2010
SCR73 Amended May 28, 2010
SCR73 Amended May 11, 2010
SCR73 Introduced February 12, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare