06/02/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
05/27/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3621.) To enrollment. | |||
05/25/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/24/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Page 5290.) To Senate. | |||
05/20/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 5253.) To third reading. | |||
05/03/2010 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on April 29.) | |||
04/15/2010 | To Com. on RULES. | |||
04/08/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
04/08/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3119.) To Assembly. | |||
02/22/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. (Introduced measure version corrected April 8.) |