LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR79
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR79
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR79
Compare Versions
SCR79 Chaptered June 2, 2010
SCR79 Enrolled May 28, 2010
SCR79 Amended May 24, 2010
SCR79 Amended May 20, 2010
SCR79 Introduced February 22, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SCR79 Chaptered June 2, 2010
SCR79 Enrolled May 28, 2010
SCR79 Amended May 24, 2010
SCR79 Amended May 20, 2010
SCR79 Introduced February 22, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare