08/20/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2010. | |||
08/20/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
08/17/2010 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
08/17/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6301.) To Senate. | |||
08/13/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee August 12.) | |||
08/12/2010 | To Com. on V.A. | |||
08/11/2010 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/11/2010 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4449.) To Assembly. | |||
08/04/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |||
08/03/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/08/2010 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |