California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR25 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SJR 25CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 98 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 20, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 20, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 11, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 3, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee MARCH 8, 2010 Relative to the Filipino Veterans Equity Compensation Fund. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SJR 25, Yee. Filipino Veterans Equity Compensation Fund. This measure would urge the President of the United States, Congress, and the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to expedite funding, and lessen the amount of required documentation necessary to allow eligible Filipino and Filipino American veterans to receive payments provided under the Filipino Veterans Equity Compensation Fund. WHEREAS, On February 17, 2009, President Obama signed into law the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (ARRA) (Public Law 111-5), which authorizes cash payments to Filipino and Filipino American veterans of World War II; and WHEREAS, Through the ARRA, Congress authorized the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to provide a total amount of compensation equaling approximately $198 million to soldiers of the Philippine Government who served in the armed forces prior to July 1, 1946, while those forces were in the service of the Armed Forces of the United States; and WHEREAS, Some recognized guerilla forces and Philippine Scouts may also be eligible for these payments; and WHEREAS, All Filipino and Filipino American veterans are required to file a VA claim form 21-4138 (CF) Statement in Support of Claim in order to receive payment from the Filipino Veterans Equity Compensation Fund; and WHEREAS, If found to be eligible, Filipino and Filipino American veterans or their survivors will receive a one-time payment of $15,000 for United States citizens, and $9,000 for non-United States citizens, and applying for this cash payment will not affect those veterans' eligibility for other existing veterans' benefits; and WHEREAS, As of January 1, 2010, 39,591 claims for payments have been received, and 11,345 applications for benefit payments have been granted; now, therefore, be it Resolved, by the Senate and Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the California Legislature respectfully urges the President of the United States, Congress, and the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to expedite funding, and lessen the amount of required documentation necessary to allow eligible Filipino and Filipino American veterans to receive payments provided under the Filipino Veterans Equity Compensation Fund; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.