06/02/2010 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2010. | |||
06/02/2010 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | |||
05/27/2010 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 3624.) To enrollment. | |||
05/17/2010 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 51. Noes 21. Page 5136.) To Senate. | |||
04/29/2010 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 4939.) To third reading. | |||
01/12/2010 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) To Third Reading. (Heard in committee on January 12.) | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
08/27/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
08/25/2009 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |||
08/24/2009 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1910.) To Assembly. | |||
06/24/2009 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1442.) To Third Reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | Set for hearing June 23. | |||
06/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/28/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |