LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR9
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR9
Compare Versions
SJR9 Chaptered June 2, 2010
SJR9 Enrolled May 28, 2010
SJR9 Amended May 13, 2010
SJR9 Amended April 29, 2010
SJR9 Amended January 4, 2010
SJR9 Introduced May 28, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SJR9 Chaptered June 2, 2010
SJR9 Enrolled May 28, 2010
SJR9 Amended May 13, 2010
SJR9 Amended April 29, 2010
SJR9 Amended January 4, 2010
SJR9 Introduced May 28, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare