|
08/08/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2393.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 1801.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|