California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill August 8, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill September 8, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011