|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2320.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1802.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|