California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1056 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill July 6, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011