|
06/28/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1953.).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1369.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1371.).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (March 16). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 0. Page 418.)
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Without reference to committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|