LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB106
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB106
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB106
Compare Versions
AB106 Chaptered June 29, 2011
AB106 Enrolled June 28, 2011
AB106 Amended June 9, 2011
AB106 Amended March 14, 2011
AB106 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB106 Chaptered June 29, 2011
AB106 Enrolled June 28, 2011
AB106 Amended June 9, 2011
AB106 Amended March 14, 2011
AB106 Introduced January 10, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare