California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1066 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2011

Amended

Bill June 15, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011