LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1066
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1066
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1066
Compare Versions
AB1066 Chaptered July 15, 2011
AB1066 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB1066 Amended June 15, 2011
AB1066 Amended May 31, 2011
AB1066 Amended April 4, 2011
AB1066 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1066 Chaptered July 15, 2011
AB1066 Enrolled July 8, 2011
AB1066 Amended June 15, 2011
AB1066 Amended May 31, 2011
AB1066 Amended April 4, 2011
AB1066 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare