|
05/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 14, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 11. Page 4762.).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 3001.).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 19).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|