California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill May 23, 2012

Amended

Bill February 23, 2012
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill May 16, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011