|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 582, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2561.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2011.).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 1781.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|