California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1077 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill July 6, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011