|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 2919.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2189.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Measure version as amended on August 29 corrected.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1499.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|