California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1102 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill August 29, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill June 14, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011