California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill August 17, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill April 6, 2011