LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1117
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1117
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1117
Compare Versions
AB1117 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB1117 Enrolled August 30, 2011
AB1117 Amended August 17, 2011
AB1117 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1117 Amended June 20, 2011
AB1117 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1117 Amended May 11, 2011
AB1117 Amended April 27, 2011
AB1117 Amended April 6, 2011
AB1117 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1117 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB1117 Enrolled August 30, 2011
AB1117 Amended August 17, 2011
AB1117 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1117 Amended June 20, 2011
AB1117 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1117 Amended May 11, 2011
AB1117 Amended April 27, 2011
AB1117 Amended April 6, 2011
AB1117 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare