|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2867.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 31).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2649.)
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1964.).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 1806.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|