California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011