|
01/31/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 3650.).
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|