California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill January 18, 2012
Bill January 13, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill April 26, 2011