California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Amended

Bill June 7, 2012
Bill January 23, 2012
Bill January 18, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012