LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1166
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1166
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1166
Compare Versions
AB1166 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1166 Amended June 7, 2012
AB1166 Amended January 23, 2012
AB1166 Amended January 18, 2012
AB1166 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1166 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1166 Enrolled August 16, 2012
AB1166 Amended June 7, 2012
AB1166 Amended January 23, 2012
AB1166 Amended January 18, 2012
AB1166 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1166 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare