California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill August 18, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill April 28, 2011