LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1215
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1215
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1215
Compare Versions
AB1215 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB1215 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB1215 Amended August 18, 2011
AB1215 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1215 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1215 Amended June 22, 2011
AB1215 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1215 Amended May 10, 2011
AB1215 Amended April 28, 2011
AB1215 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1215 Chaptered September 26, 2011
AB1215 Enrolled September 8, 2011
AB1215 Amended August 18, 2011
AB1215 Amended August 15, 2011
AB1215 Amended July 12, 2011
AB1215 Amended June 22, 2011
AB1215 Amended May 27, 2011
AB1215 Amended May 10, 2011
AB1215 Amended April 28, 2011
AB1215 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare