|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 466, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6531.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4906.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1466.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|