California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 11, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill June 20, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011