|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3093.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2348.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 2049.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1854.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1690.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|