California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1219 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 24, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill June 1, 2011
Bill May 17, 2011
Bill May 4, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011