|
09/22/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5879.).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4321.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1662.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|