California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1223 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/16/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1223ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE JULY 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 13, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Veterans Affairs (Cook (Chair), Pan (Vice Chair), Atkins, Block, Gorell, Nielsen, V. Manuel Prez, Williams, and Yamada) (Coauthor: Assembly Member Beth Gaines) FEBRUARY 18, 2011 An act to repeal and add Section 14124.11 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1223, Committee on Veterans Affairs. Medi-Cal: Public Assistance Reporting Information System. Existing law provides for the Medi-Cal program, which is administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which qualified low-income individuals receive health care services. The Medi-Cal program is, in part, governed and funded by federal Medicaid Program provisions. Existing law requires the department to establish a 2-year pilot program to utilize the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS) to identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are enrolled in the Medi-Cal program and assist them in obtaining federal veterans' health care benefits. Existing law requires the department to select 3 counties, as specified, to participate in the pilot project and authorizes the department to implement the program statewide at any time and continue the operation of PARIS indefinitely if the department determines that the pilot program is cost effective. This bill would remove the pilot project nature of these provisions and would require the department to implement this program statewide. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 14124.11 of the Welfare and Institutions Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 14124.11 is added to the Welfare and Institutions Code, to read: 14124.11. (a) The department shall utilize the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS) to identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are enrolled in the Medi-Cal program and assist them in obtaining federal veteran health care benefits. (b) The department shall exchange information with PARIS and identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are receiving Medi-Cal benefits. (c) The department shall refer identified Medi-Cal beneficiaries who are receiving high-cost services, including long-term care, to county veteran service officers (CVSOs) to obtain information regarding, and assistance in obtaining, USDVA benefits. (d) In implementing this section, the department shall do all of the following: (1) Enter into an agreement with the California Department of Veterans Affairs (CDVA) to perform CVSO outreach services. The CDVA agreement shall contain performance standards that will allow the department to measure the effectiveness of the program established by this section. (2) Enter into any agreements that are required by the federal government to utilize the PARIS system. (3) Perform any information technology activities that are necessary to utilize the PARIS system. (e) Notwithstanding Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, the department may implement, interpret, or make specific, this section by means of written directives without taking further regulatory action. (f) In order to achieve maximum cost savings, the Legislature hereby determines that an expedited contract process for contracts under this section is necessary. Therefore, contracts under this section shall be exempt from the Public Contract Code and from Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 11250) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code.