|
09/08/2011
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments and whereby the bill was ordered to enrollment. Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2964.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2973.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2306.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1565.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|