California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Amended

Bill July 11, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill May 5, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011