|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 853, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6505.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4859.).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Vargas.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1590.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1495.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|