LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1248
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1248
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1248
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 18, 2011
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 11, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 30, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
May 21, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 10, 2012
Compare
Bill
June 30, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 23, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 14, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 31, 2011
Compare