|
05/10/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 709.).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 530.).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 2).
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 24). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|