California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB125 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2011

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2011

Chaptered

Bill May 10, 2011

Amended

Bill March 7, 2011
Bill February 22, 2011