California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 9, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill April 13, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011