LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1277
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1277
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1277
Compare Versions
AB1277 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB1277 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1277 Amended August 9, 2012
AB1277 Amended July 5, 2012
AB1277 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1277 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1277 Amended June 29, 2011
AB1277 Amended April 13, 2011
AB1277 Amended March 31, 2011
AB1277 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1277 Chaptered September 28, 2012
AB1277 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1277 Amended August 9, 2012
AB1277 Amended July 5, 2012
AB1277 Amended June 20, 2012
AB1277 Amended January 4, 2012
AB1277 Amended June 29, 2011
AB1277 Amended April 13, 2011
AB1277 Amended March 31, 2011
AB1277 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare