|
09/30/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2566.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1671.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|