LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1293
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1293
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1293
Compare Versions
AB1293 Chaptered September 30, 2011
AB1293 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB1293 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1293 Amended May 11, 2011
AB1293 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1293 Chaptered September 30, 2011
AB1293 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB1293 Amended June 28, 2011
AB1293 Amended May 11, 2011
AB1293 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare